EP3954361 - MULTIPHASIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sequessome Technology Holdings Limited Palazzo Pietro Stiges 103 Strait Street Valletta 1436 / MT | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARRAWAY, Richard Wolf 13 Bedford Square, London Greater London, WC1B 3RA / GB | 02 /
HENRY, William 13 Bedford Square, London Greater London, WC1B 3RA / GB | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Eldridge, Kathryn, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21189470.4 | 30.06.2016 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | GB20150011469 | 30.06.2015 Original published format: GB 201511469 | GB20150011478 | 30.06.2015 Original published format: GB 201511478 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954361 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K8/43, A61K9/10, A61K31/155, A61P17/00, A61K47/26, A61K47/24, A61K9/127 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
A61K31/618 (EP,US);
A61K31/7008 (EP,US);
A61K31/737 (EP,US);
A61K47/24 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/14 (US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61P17/04 (EP,US);
A61P17/10 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/02 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/60, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/618, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7008, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRPHASIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2022/07] | English: | MULTIPHASIC COMPOSITIONS | [2022/07] | French: | COMPOSITIONS MULTIPHASIQUES | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 12.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16733595.9 / EP3316857 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2023 | 30.06.2024 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008039989 (TRANSAVE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * example 3; claim 18 * [I] 3-10,12-17; | [Y]WO2009106338 (LIPOTEC SA [ES], et al) [Y] 1-17* examples 9,15 *; | [XI]WO2013171132 (SEQUESSOME TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS LTD [MT]) [X] 1,2,4,7-11,13,15-17 * page 31, lines 10-14; examples 1-129; claims 1-17 * * page 29, line 18 * * page 29, line 21 - page 30, line 20 * [I] 3,5,6,12,14; | [Y] - LORENA TAVANO ET AL, "Niosomesmicroemulsions: New carriers for topical delivery of Capsaicin", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES. B, BIOINTERFACES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 87, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.COLSURFB.2011.05.041, ISSN 0927-7765, (20110520), pages 333 - 339, (20110527), XP028248617 [Y] 1-17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.colsurfb.2011.05.041 | [Y] - TRIF M ET AL, "Liposomes-entrapped chondroitin sulphate: Ultrastructural characterization and in vitro biocompatibility", MICRON, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, vol. 39, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.MICRON.2008.01.008, ISSN 0968-4328, (20081001), pages 1042 - 1045, (20080120), XP023781397 [Y] 1-17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micron.2008.01.008 | by applicant | EP0475160 | US6165500 | US2002012680 | US2004071767 | US2004105881 | WO2010140061 | WO2011022707 | WO2013171131 | WO2015014965 | - CEVC, Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (20020000), vol. 1564, pages 21 - 30 | - JANICZEK-DOLPHIN N1COOK JTHIBOUTOT DHARNESS JCLUCAS A, "Can sebum reduction predict acne outcome?", Br J Dermatol, (20101000), vol. 163, no. 4, pages 683 - 8 |