Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
03.05.2023 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
21.04.2023 | Change - priority | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
17.04.2023 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
17.02.2023 | Change - representative | |
03.01.2023 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.09.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] |
22.04.2022 | Change - representative | |
06.08.2021 | Change - representative |