Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022207434 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21189665 | 04.08.2021 | WO2021CN84511 | 31.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023389750 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21189665 | 04.08.2021 | WO2021CN84511 | 31.03.2021 | WO2022EP57692 | 23.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4181745 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | B1 | EP4181745 | 24.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21189665 | 04.08.2021 | WO2021CN84511 | 31.03.2021 | WO2022EP57692 | 23.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116234483B | Global Dossier | 07.06.2024 | B | CN116234483 | 06.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21189665 | 04.08.2021 | WO2021CN84511 | 31.03.2021 | WO2022EP57692 | 23.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4066703 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN84511 | 31.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112023004888 | 06.02.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP21189665 | 04.08.2021 | WO2021CN84511 | 31.03.2021 | WO2022EP57692 | 23.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023003226 | 14.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21189665 | 04.08.2021 | WO2021CN84511 | 31.03.2021 | WO2022EP57692 | 23.03.2022 |