EP4066703 - DOMESTIC KITCHEN APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAO, Wei Shun 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
XIAO, Weimin 5656 AE EINDHOVEN / NL | 03 /
LUO, Zhongchi 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
LI, Ming 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
KUI, Xiao Yun 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Vollering, Stefanus Franciscus Maria Philips Domestic Appliances IP Department High Tech Campus 42 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | de Vries, Janna, et al Philips Domestic Appliances Nederland B.V. High Tech Campus 42 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 21189665.9 | 04.08.2021 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2023/21] |
Former [2022/40] | WO2021CN84511 | 31.03.2021 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4066703 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47J36/32, A47J37/06, A47J27/086, A47J27/04 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
A47J37/0641 (EP);
A47J36/32 (EP);
A47J2027/043 (EP);
A47J27/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSKÜCHENGERÄT | [2022/40] | English: | DOMESTIC KITCHEN APPARATUS | [2022/40] | French: | APPAREIL DE CUISINE DOMESTIQUE | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 06.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/38] | 02.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016327279 (BHOGAL NIKHIL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0059]; figures 10,11 *; | [XAI]WO2018019620 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,7,10,12,15 * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 31; figures 1,3 * [A] 8,11,13,14 [I] 2-6,9; | [XAI]AU2018215274 (SEB SA) [X] 1,7,12-15 * paragraphs [0092] , [0093] , [0101] - [0106] - [0118] * [A] 8,10,11 [I] 2-6,9; | [X]US10760794 (CHENG SHIH-YU [US]) [X] 1 * column 12, lines 45-48; figure 5A *; | [A]US10819905 (LIU QIANG [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 13, lines 43-59; figure 3 * |