EP4130293 - METHOD OF MUTATION DETECTION IN A LIQUID BIOPSY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OncoDNA SA Avenue Louis Breguet 1 6041 Gosselies / BE | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAES, Jean-François 1400 Nivelles / BE | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Calysta NV Lambroekstraat 5a 1831 Diegem / BE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21189685.7 | 04.08.2021 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4130293 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6806, C12Q1/6886, G16B30/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
G16B20/20 (EP);
G16B35/20 (EP);
C12Q2525/204 (EP);
C12Q2535/122 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MUTATIONSDETEKTION IN EINER FLÜSSIGEN BIOPSIE | [2023/06] | English: | METHOD OF MUTATION DETECTION IN A LIQUID BIOPSY | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE MUTATION DANS UNE BIOPSIE LIQUIDE | [2023/06] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/03] | 31.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2018195483 (ILLUMINIA INC [US]); | [YD]WO2020094775 (CANCER RESEARCH TECH LTD [GB]); | [IY]WO2020104670 (CANCER RESEARCH TECH LTD [GB]); | [Y]WO2020186024 (GRAIL INC [US]); | by applicant | EP3612964 | WO2020094775 | US2020294624 |