EP3960493 - HEAVY DUTY TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken 651-0072 / JP | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HABA, Toshifumi Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2023/49] |
Former [2022/09] | 01 /
HABA, Toshifumi Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 21189795.4 | 05.08.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | JP20200143713 | 27.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020143713 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3960493 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3960493 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, B60C9/28, B60C11/00, B60C11/03 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
B60C15/0607 (US);
B60C11/005 (EP);
B60C9/28 (EP);
C08K3/36 (US);
C08K5/548 (US);
C08L9/00 (US);
B60C2001/0083 (US);
B60C2011/0025 (EP);
B60C2011/0033 (EP);
B60C2011/0355 (EP);
B60C2200/06 (EP,US);
C08K2201/006 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHWERLASTREIFEN | [2022/09] | English: | HEAVY DUTY TIRE | [2022/09] | French: | PNEU POIDS LOURD | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 01.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0738614 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 2, line 8; figures 1,2; claims 1-12; tables 1,2 * * page 10, lines 11-16 * * page 7, lines 14-25 *; | [Y]EP1535961 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0051]; claims 1-16; table 1 *; | [Y]US2007084533 (NUMATA KAZUKI [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] , [0032]; figures 1,2; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]US2017166012 (TODOROKI DAISUKE [JP]) [Y] 1-12* paragraphs [0044] - [0050]; figures 1,2; claims 1-20 *; | [Y]EP3301132 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0063] , [0069]; claims 1-5; tables 1-3 * | by applicant | JPH06279624 |