EP4134670 - A HEMATOLOGY ANALYZER COMPRISING A SINGLE HARDWARE MODULE AND INTEGRATED WORKFLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc. 511 Benedict Avenue Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mach, Tivadar 90409 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Paulicka, Peter 91341 Röttenbach / DE | 03 /
Seliger, Ramona 91346 Wiesenttal-Muggendorf / DE | 04 /
Stelling, Frederick Newburgh, 12550 / US | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21190254.9 | 09.08.2021 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4134670 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/491 (EP);
G01N33/492 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄMATOLOGIEANALYSATOR MIT EINEM EINZIGEN HARDWARE-MODUL UND INTEGRIERTEM ARBEITSABLAUF | [2023/07] | English: | A HEMATOLOGY ANALYZER COMPRISING A SINGLE HARDWARE MODULE AND INTEGRATED WORKFLOW | [2023/07] | French: | ANALYSEUR D'HÉMATOLOGIE COMPORTANT UN MODULE MATÉRIEL UNIQUE ET UN FLUX DE TRAVAIL INTÉGRÉ | [2023/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/05] | 07.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004054283 (COREY SCOTT [US], et al); | [IY]US2016202237 (ZENG HANSONG [US], et al); | [A]US2017248618 (BAXTER ANDREW JOHN [GB], et al); | [A]WO2018065626 (ACOUSORT AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2020197993 (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) | by applicant | WO2017157445 | EP3540631 | EP3575848 |