EP3993364 - METHOD FOR CO-HOSTING, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Dajia Internet Information Technology Co., Ltd. Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor Building 1, No.6, Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Jinxiong Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
LEI, Yu Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
TAN, Peiqiang Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Yang, Shu Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21190434.7 | 09.08.2021 | [2022/18] | Priority number, date | CN202011172660 | 28.10.2020 Original published format: CN202011172660 | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993364 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3993364 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/1093, H04L65/401, H04N21/2187, H04N21/422, H04N21/4788, H04N21/64, H04N21/643 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
H04L65/1093 (EP);
H04N21/4788 (EP,CN);
H04N21/239 (US);
H04L65/4015 (EP);
H04N21/2187 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/234 (US);
H04N21/236 (US);
H04N21/25808 (CN);
H04N21/42203 (EP);
H04N21/64 (EP);
H04N21/643 (EP);
H04N21/654 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | H04L65/1093, H04L65/401 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM CO-HOSTING UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | METHOD FOR CO-HOSTING, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CO-HÉBERGEMENT, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 31.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.10.2022 | AT | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | IT | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | NL | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | RS | 19.10.2022 | SE | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | NO | 19.01.2023 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/16] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 19.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN111385592 (GUANGZHOU BIGO INFORMATION TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - ROSENBERG J ET AL, "SIP: Session Initiation Protocol", 20020601; 20020600, (20020601), pages 1 - 269, XP015009039 [X] 1-8,10-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SINGH AAMEEK ET AL, "SPLAT: a unified SIP services platform for VoIP applications", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS., GB, (20060501), vol. 19, no. 4, doi:10.1002/dac.786, ISSN 1074-5351, pages 425 - 444, XP055881216 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/dac.786 | [A] - MAHY AIRESPACE D PETRIE PINGTEL R, "The Session Initiation Protocol (SIP) "Join" Header; rfc3911.txt", THE SESSION INITIATION PROTOCOL (SIP) "JOIN" HEADER; RFC3911.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARD, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20041001), XP015009684 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |