Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11665386 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2023 | B2 | US2022132176 | 28.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202011172660 | 28.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112312226B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2023 | B | CN112312226 | 02.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202011172660 | 28.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3993364 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2022 | B1 | EP3993364 | 04.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202011172660 | 28.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021010211 | 29.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202011172660 | 28.10.2020 |