EP4134146 - FILTER CARTRIDGE FOR FILTRATION OF LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITA SE Heinz-Hankammer-Straße 1 65232 Taunusstein / DE | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNARD, Dominik 55118 Mainz / DE | 02 /
ZÖLLER, Jochen 56355 Nastätten / DE | 03 /
REDER, Ernst 55278 Hahnheim / DE | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21190517.9 | 10.08.2021 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4134146 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D27/02, B01D27/14, C02F1/00, C02F1/28, C02F1/42 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
B01D27/02 (EP,US);
B01D24/105 (US);
B01D27/146 (EP);
C02F1/003 (EP);
C02F1/283 (EP);
C02F1/42 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERPATRONE ZUR FILTRATION VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2023/07] | English: | FILTER CARTRIDGE FOR FILTRATION OF LIQUIDS | [2023/07] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE FILTRE POUR LA FILTRATION DE LIQUIDES | [2023/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/04] | 06.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3831754 (HESKETT D); | [A]WO02102722 (PRISMEDICAL CORP [US]); | [A]US2005077223 (SEIBERT ROY E [US]); | [XI]US2009008318 (ANES JOHN M [US], et al); | [A]US2016309950 (MITCHELL ALAN JOSEPH [US], et al) |