EP3960277 - AIR PREPARATION DEVICE FOR AN AIR-COOLING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mirai Intex Sagl Via Luigi Pasteur 1 6830 Chiasso / CH | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsyplakov, Vladyslav 1290 Versoix / CH | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Musil, Dobroslav Dobroslav Musil a partneri s.r.o. Zabrdovicka 11 615 00 Brno / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Musil, Dobroslav Zàbrdovicka 11 615 00 Brno / CZ | Application number, filing date | 21190548.4 | 10.08.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | CZ20200004530 | 11.08.2020 Original published format: CZ 20204530 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3960277 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, F25B43/00, F25B9/00 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
B01D53/261 (EP);
B01D53/266 (CZ);
B01D53/268 (EP);
F25B43/003 (CZ);
F25B9/004 (CZ);
B01D2258/06 (EP);
B01D2259/4508 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTAUFBEREITUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE LUFTKÜHLMASCHINE | [2022/09] | English: | AIR PREPARATION DEVICE FOR AN AIR-COOLING MACHINE | [2022/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉPARATION D'AIR POUR MACHINE DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'AIR | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 31.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |