EP3961039 - PUMP FOR CONVEYING A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Management AG Neuwiesenstrasse 15 8401 Winterthur / CH | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giardino, Flavio 8112 Otelfingen / CH | 02 /
Welschinger, Thomas 78315 Radolfzell / DE | 03 /
Johne, Torsten 8355 Aadorf / CH | 04 /
Hirzel, Flurin 8405 Winterthur / CH | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | IPS Irsch AG Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 21190581.5 | 10.08.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | EP20200193675 | 31.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20193675 | [2022/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3961039 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3961039 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F04D1/06, F04D17/12, F04D29/42, F04D29/62 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
F04D1/063 (EP);
F04D1/06 (CN);
F04D17/122 (EP);
F04D29/4206 (EP);
F04D29/426 (EP,CN);
F04D29/624 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PUMPE ZUM FÖRDERN EINES FLUIDES | [2022/09] | English: | PUMP FOR CONVEYING A FLUID | [2022/09] | French: | POMPE PERMETTANT DE TRANSPORTER UN FLUIDE | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 02.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2196895 (BOWMAN ROBERT A); | [A]EP0889277 (GHH BORSIG TURBOMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP1010931 (SCHLEMENAT ALFRED [DE]); | [XAI]US2008031732 (PEER DAVID J [US], et al); | [XI]DE102016205528 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |