EP3954554 - CLUTCH SYSTEM WITH BEND ANGLE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAF-HOLLAND GmbH Hauptstrasse 26 63856 Bessenbach / DE | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EISELEIN, Jörg-Ottmar 78256 Steißlingen / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Daniel 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | 01 /
EISELEIN, Jörg-Ottmar 78256 Steißlingen / DE | ||
02 /
ROTHENBÜCHER, Daniel 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21190778.7 | 11.08.2021 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | DE202010121315 | 13.08.2020 Original published format: DE102020121315 | [2022/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954554 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/01, B60D1/62 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
B62D53/08 (EP);
B60D1/015 (EP);
B60D1/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSSYSTEM MIT KNICKWINKELMESSUNG | [2022/07] | English: | CLUTCH SYSTEM WITH BEND ANGLE MEASUREMENT | [2022/07] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ACCOUPLEMENT À MESURE D'ANGLE DE PIVOTEMENT | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 10.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2415620 (WESTFALIA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* figures 1-27 *; | [X]EP2815950 (SCHARMÜLLER JOSEF [AT]) [X] 1,4,14 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-11 *; | [XA]EP2899101 (FLIEGL HELMUT [DE]) [X] 1,4,14 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,3,5-13,15 |