EP3985154 - APPARATUS FOR TREATING LAUNDRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jihong 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
JEONG, Kwanwoong 08592 Seoul / KR | 03 /
JEONG, Yeongho 08592 Seoul / KR | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 21190983.3 | 12.08.2021 | [2022/16] | Priority number, date | KR20200133538 | 15.10.2020 Original published format: KR 20200133538 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3985154 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06F31/00, D06F34/20, // D06F23/04, D06F39/14 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
D06F31/00 (EP);
D06F37/18 (KR);
D06F39/14 (EP,KR,US);
D06F34/20 (EP,KR);
D06F37/28 (KR);
D06F37/40 (KR);
D06F37/42 (KR);
D06F39/088 (US);
D06F2103/40 (US);
D06F23/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WÄSCHE | [2022/16] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TREATING LAUNDRY | [2022/16] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DU LINGE | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 23.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102008058268 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]EP3133202 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]CN104805654B ; | [A]WO2019208964 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | by applicant | KR20190120654 |