EP3961715 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Chang Yeong Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jong Woo Hwaseong-si / KR | 03 /
JU, Yong Chan Yongin-si / KR | 04 /
HA, Jae Heung Suwon-si / KR | 05 /
KIM, Won Jong Suwon-si / KR | 06 /
PARK, Hee Yeon Seoul / KR | 07 /
YANG, Hye In Siheung-si / KR | 08 /
JUNG, Woo Suk Yongin-si / KR | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Shearman, James Ward Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 21191113.6 | 12.08.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | KR20200101676 | 13.08.2020 Original published format: KR 20200101676 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3961715 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L51/00, H01L51/52 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
H10K59/124 (EP,US);
G06F3/0412 (KR);
H10K59/40 (CN,KR,US);
H10K50/844 (US);
H10K59/122 (US);
H10K71/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K77/111 (EP,US);
H10K2102/311 (EP,US);
H10K59/1201 (US);
H10K59/131 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K59/8731 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K71/80 (EP,CN,KR);
Y02E10/549 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/09] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE SAME | [2022/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 02.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017288168 (KIM GUNMO [KR], et al); | [XI]US2019207131 (LU MACAI [CN]); | [XI]WO2019183935 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD [CN]); | [XI]EP3651201 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]EP3660818 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN111243442 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) |