EP3937003 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EFFICIENT DELIVERY AND USAGE OF AUDIO MESSAGES FOR HIGH QUALITY OF EXPERIENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2022/02] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murtaza, Adrian 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Fuchs, Harald 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Czelhan, Bernd 91058 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
Plogsties, Jan 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 21191482.5 | 10.10.2018 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | EP20170196255 | 12.10.2017 Original published format: EP 17196255 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3937003 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3937003 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/81 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
H04N21/21805 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/16 (CN,RU);
G06F3/167 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N21/2335 (CN,US);
H04N21/4728 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/167 (CN,KR,RU,US);
H04N21/234309 (CN,US);
H04N21/234318 (CN,US);
H04N21/2353 (CN,US);
H04N21/2368 (CN,US);
H04N21/44218 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N21/8106 (EP,CN,KR);
H04N21/8456 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | G06F3/16, H04N19/167, H04N21/218, H04N21/845, H04N21/4728, H04N21/442, H04N21/81 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] |
Former [2022/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EFFIZIENTEN BEREITSTELLUNG UND NUTZUNG VON AUDIONACHRICHTEN FÜR EINE HOHE ERLEBNISQUALITÄT | [2022/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EFFICIENT DELIVERY AND USAGE OF AUDIO MESSAGES FOR HIGH QUALITY OF EXPERIENCE | [2022/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT UNE DISTRIBUTION ET UNE UTILISATION EFFICACES DE MESSAGES AUDIO POUR UNE EXPÉRIENCE DE HAUTE QUALITÉ | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 21.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18782460.2 / EP3695306 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013205247 (ERHARD KLAUS [DE], et al); | [XY]EP3037915 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]); | [Y]US2016381398 (SAXENA ANKUR [US], et al); |