EP3960206 - METHOD FOR ERADICATING METHICILLIN-RESISTANT STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHOTT AG Hattenbergstraße 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2022/10] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petershans, André 92507 Nabburg / DE | 02 /
Megges, Klaus 92637 Weiden i. d. Oberpfalz / DE | 03 /
Krüger, Susanne 55127 Mainz / DE | 04 /
Pfeiffer, Thomas 55218 Ingelheim / DE | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Tower 185 Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 35-37 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Westhafenplatz 1 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 21191643.2 | 17.08.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | EP20200211687 | 03.12.2020 Original published format: EP 20211687 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3960206 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3960206 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/00, A61L2/10, C03C3/089, C03C4/00, C02F1/00, G01N30/00 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
A61L2/10 (EP,CN,US);
C03C3/118 (EP,US);
A61L2/0047 (EP);
A61L2/26 (US);
A61L9/20 (EP);
C02F1/325 (EP);
C03C3/089 (EP,US);
C03C3/091 (US);
C03C3/093 (US);
C03C3/115 (US);
C03C4/0085 (EP,US);
A61L2202/11 (EP,US);
A61L2202/25 (EP);
C02F2201/3222 (EP);
C03C2204/00 (US);
Y02W10/37 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSROTTUNG VON METHICILLIN-RESISTENTEM STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2022/09] | English: | METHOD FOR ERADICATING METHICILLIN-RESISTANT STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2022/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉRADICATION DE STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS RÉSISTANT À LA MÉTHICILLINE | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 23.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |