EP3960099 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING FORWARD DIRECTED SHOCK WAVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shockwave Medical, Inc. 5403 Betsy Ross Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Hoa D. Santa Clara / US | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Sackin, Robert Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 21191690.3 | 29.05.2018 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | US201762521994P | 19.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762521994 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3960099 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3960099 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
A61B17/22022 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/2202 (EP,CN,US);
A61M25/10181 (US);
A61M25/10186 (US);
A61M25/104 (US);
A61M5/007 (US);
A61B2017/22001 (CN,US);
A61B2017/22025 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/22028 (CN,US);
A61B2017/22038 (CN,US);
A61B2017/22051 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/22062 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON VORWÄRTSGERICHTETEN STOSSWELLEN | [2022/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR GENERATING FORWARD DIRECTED SHOCK WAVES | [2022/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'ONDES DE CHOC DIRIGÉES VERS L'AVANT | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 11.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18731325.9 / EP3641672 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9203975 (CANNON ROBERT L III [FR]); | [A]US5254121 (MANEVITZ BERNARD [US], et al); | [AD]US8888788 (HAKALA DOUG [US], et al); | [AD]US8956371 (HAWKINS DANIEL [US], et al) | by applicant | US8888788 | US8956371 | US2015320432 |