Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
05.03.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
07.11.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
28.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.07.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
15.03.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
14.06.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
25.03.2022 | Change - designated states | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
03.03.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
28.01.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
28.01.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
28.01.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
28.01.2022 | First examination report |