EP3961818 - POTENTIAL DISTRIBUTION ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reibke, Heinz 32105 Bad Salzuflen / DE | 02 /
Jarmuth, Volker 32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE | 03 /
GÖRLITZER, Dirk 31800 Hessisch Oldendorf / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 21191837.0 | 18.08.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | LU20200102017 | 25.08.2020 Original published format: LU 102017 | [2022/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3961818 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/26, // H01R13/05, H01R13/11 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
H01R9/2675 (EP,CN);
H01R9/2458 (EP);
H01R9/2625 (CN);
H01R13/055 (EP);
H01R13/113 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POTENTIALVERTEILERANORDNUNG | [2022/09] | English: | POTENTIAL DISTRIBUTION ARRANGEMENT | [2022/09] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE DISTRIBUTION DES POTENTIELS | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 20.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19718996 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-4 * [I] 4-11; | [X]FR2889366 (LOIACONO HERVE [FR], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP2562879 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP3621161 (TE CONNECTIVITY GERMANY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3* figures 1,2 * |