EP4030066 - ROTARY SHAFT SLEEVE FOR CROSS-FLOW FAN OF AIR CONDITIONER AND AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAN, Lianyu Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 21192043.4 | 19.08.2021 | [2022/29] | Priority number, date | CN20212085778U | 13.01.2021 Original published format: CN 202120085778 U | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030066 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4030066 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/056, F16C27/06, F04D17/04, F04D9/06, F04D29/06, F16C17/02, F16C27/02, F16C33/10, F24F1/0025 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
F04D29/668 (EP);
F04D29/056 (EP);
F04D29/063 (EP);
F16C27/063 (EP);
F16C33/102 (EP);
F16C33/103 (EP);
F04D17/04 (EP);
F16C2360/44 (EP);
F16C2362/52 (EP);
F24F1/0025 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] |
Former [2022/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DREHWELLENHÜLSE FÜR QUERSTROMLÜFTER EINER KLIMAANLAGE SOWIE KLIMAANLAGE | [2022/29] | English: | ROTARY SHAFT SLEEVE FOR CROSS-FLOW FAN OF AIR CONDITIONER AND AIR CONDITIONER | [2022/29] | French: | MANCHON D'ARBRE ROTATIF POUR VENTILATEUR TANGENTIEL DE CLIMATISEUR ET CLIMATISEUR | [2022/29] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 19.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2024 | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3250579 (TUPPER MYRON D, et al) [A] 2 * figures 5,7 *; | [A]DE202008001613U (EBM PAPST ST GEORGEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 2* figure 3 *; | [A]EP2682620 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2 * figure 8 *; | [XA]CN211400073U (GUANGDONG MIDEA REFRIGERATION EQUIPMENT CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,15 * figure 7 * [A] 2-14 |