EP4137282 - MOUNTING ASSEMBLY FOR A HAIR CUTTING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETRELLI, Marcus Cornelis 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DE VRIES, Alwin William 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
HIN, Theodoor René Maria 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 21192092.1 | 19.08.2021 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4137282 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/04, B26B19/06 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
B26B19/048 (EP);
B26B19/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONTAGEANORDNUNG FÜR EIN HAARSCHNEIDEGERÄT | [2023/08] | English: | MOUNTING ASSEMBLY FOR A HAIR CUTTING APPLIANCE | [2023/08] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MONTAGE POUR APPAREIL DE COUPE DE CHEVEUX | [2023/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/05] | 12.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5165172 (WEINRAUCH DAVID [US]); | [A]WO2015158681 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [AD]US2018085935 (ERNDT ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [A]EP3687747 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) | by applicant | US2003019107 | US2018085935 |