EP4138521 - EFFICIENT LOGICAL ASSIGNMENT OF DALI-2 OCCUPANCY SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Freilagerstrasse 40 8047 Zürich / CH | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skoczylas, Piotr 8910 Affoltern am Albis / CH | 02 /
Bättig, Markus 6012 Obernau / CH | 03 /
Kyburz, Beat 8913 Ottenbach / CH | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/08] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21192277.8 | 20.08.2021 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4138521 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B47/175 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
H05B47/175 (EP);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTE LOGISCHE ZUORDNUNG VON DALI-2 PRÄSENZMELDER | [2023/08] | English: | EFFICIENT LOGICAL ASSIGNMENT OF DALI-2 OCCUPANCY SENSORS | [2023/08] | French: | AFFECTATION LOGIQUE EFFICACE DES DÉTECTEURS DE PRÉSENCE DALI-2 | [2023/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/05] | 12.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2362714 (REDWOOD SYSTEM INC [US]) [Y] 1-19 * column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 * * column 1 - column 2, paragraph 5 * * column 2, paragraph 8 - column 3, paragraph 11 * * column 5, paragraph 22 - column 24, paragraph 89 * * esp. pars. [0027], [0032], [0033], [0064], [0069]-[0087] *; | [Y]US2020287786 (ANDERSON TODD G [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 15; figures 1-15 * * page 3, paragraph 38 - page 50, paragraph 378 ** esp. pars. [0096], [0109]-[0114], [0116], [0129], [0133], [0134], [0161]-[0230] *; | [Y]EP3790363 (TRIDONIC GMBH & CO KG [AT]) [Y] 1-19 * column 1, paragraphs 1-4; figures 1-10 * * column 1, paragraph 6 - column 5, paragraph 27 * * column 5, paragraph 30 - column 8, paragraph 50 * * esp. pars. [0001], [0004], [0009]-[0012], [0017], [0019], [0021]-[0024], [0030]-[033], [0036], [0038], [0040]-[0042], [0045],[0047], [0049]; Figs. 1-3, 7-10 * |