EP4138089 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR PERSONALIZED TRAINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deweer, N. Rue des Bergers 3 boite 52 7500 Tournai / BE | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deweer, Nicolas 7500 Tournai / BE | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Calysta NV Lambroekstraat 5a 1831 Diegem / BE | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 21192426.1 | 20.08.2021 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4138089 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/30, A61B5/00, A63B21/00, A63B24/00, G09B19/00, A61B5/22 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
G16H20/30 (EP);
A63B24/0087 (EP);
G09B19/0038 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
A61B5/224 (EP);
A61B5/6895 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM FÜR PERSONALISIERTES TRAINING | [2023/08] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR PERSONALIZED TRAINING | [2023/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR L' ENTRAÎNEMENT PERSONNALISÉE | [2023/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 12.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4702108 (AMUNDSEN LOUIS R [US], et al) [X] 1,12,15 * summary, columns 15-16,18 *[A] 2-11,13,14; | [XI]US5398696 (WILEY RONALD L [US]) [X] 1,12,15 * summary;; figure 3; claims 1-7 * [I] 2-11,13,14; | [XI]US2007087913 (JAQUISH JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 1,12,15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0057] , [0058] , [0059] , [0063]; figures 2,3 * [I] 2-11,13,14; | [XI]US2018001181 (VON PRELLWITZ LEONARDO [US], et al) [X] 1,12,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0026] , [0032] , [0037] , [0040] , [0045] - [0048] - [0052] , [0064] , [0065] , [0068] , [0074] , [0082] , [0085] , [0087]; figure 10; claim 1 * [I] 2-11,13,14; | [XI]US2021128963 (ANDERSON DUANE [US]) [X] 1,12,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0017] , [0018] - [0027] - [0034] , [0036] , [0039] , [0055] - [0057] - [0068] - [0072] - [0077]; figures 1,2,8 * [I] 2-11,13,14 | by applicant | EP1859737 | US10058265 | CN109363672 | US10409961 | US2019343459 | US10688345 |