EP3939586 - COMBINATION OF PEMAFIBRATE AND OMEGA-3 FATTY ACIDS FOR DYSLIPEDMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOWA COMPANY, LTD. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 460-8625 / JP | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKIZAWA, Toshiaki Tokyo 189-0022 / JP | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB, et al Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Weist, Stefan, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21192564.9 | 27.08.2014 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | JP20130176364 | 28.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013176364 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3939586 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/423, A61K31/202, A61K31/232, A61P3/06, A61P9/10, A61P43/00 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/423 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/232 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61K2300/00 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/232, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/423, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] |
Former [2022/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMBINATION VON PEMAFIBRATE UND OMEGA-3 FETTSÄUREN BEI DYSLIPEDMIE | [2022/03] | English: | COMBINATION OF PEMAFIBRATE AND OMEGA-3 FATTY ACIDS FOR DYSLIPEDMIA | [2022/03] | French: | COMBINAISON DE PEMAFIBRATE ET D'ACIDES GRAS OMEGA-3 POUR LA DYSLIPIDÉMIE | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 12.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14841322.2 / EP3040071 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006062932 (RELIANT PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0015] , [0030] , [0054] - [0057]; examples 1-3; claims 1-4 *; | [Y] - JEAN-CHARLES FRUCHART, "Selective peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor[alpha] modulators (SPPARM[alpha]): The next generation of peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor", CARDIOVASCULAR DIABETOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20130531), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1475-2840-12-82, ISSN 1475-2840, page 82, XP021153244 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 5, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 6, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2840-12-82 | [Y] - JWANNY ETIDAL W ET AL, "Improved lipid lowering activity of fibrates in combination with fish oil ethyl esters in hypertriglyceridemic hamsters", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2004), Database accession no. PREV200500164553, XP002767616 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [ ] - ADVANCES IN FOOD SCIENCES, (2004), vol. 26, no. 4, ISSN 1431-7737, pages 159 - 167 | [T] - Z. GAJDOSIK, "Pemafibrate. Selective PPARalpha modulator, Treatment of dyslipidemia", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, ES, (20160101), vol. 41, no. 2, doi:10.1358/dof.2016.041.02.2412776, ISSN 0377-8282, page 111, XP055349188 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2016.041.02.2412776 | by applicant | WO03043997 | WO2004103997 | WO2005009942 | WO2005023777 | WO2005097784 | WO2006033891 | WO2006049232 | WO2008006043 | JP2008524120 | WO2009047240 | WO2009080248 | - Folia Pharmacol. Jpn., (20070000), vol. 129, pages 267 - 270 | - J. Lipid Research, (19960000), vol. 37, pages 907 - 925 | - Trends in Endocrinology and Metabolism, (20040000), vol. 15, no. 7, pages 324 - 330 | - Eur. J. Pharmacol., (19930000), vol. 231, pages 121 - 127 | - Atherosclerosis, (19900000), vol. 18, no. 5, page 536 | - J. Atheroscler. Thromb., (20090000), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 283 - 291 | - USUI S et al., Clin. Chem., (20000000), vol. 46, pages 63 - 72 | - USUI S, Clin Chem, (20000000), vol. 46, pages 63 - 72 |