EP3936959 - METHOD AND APPARATUS TO DIAGNOSE A LINEAR SYNCHRONOUS MOTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation, Inc. 1 Allen Bradley Drive Mayfield Hts, OH 44124 / US | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Yuhong Acton, MA 01720 / US | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 21192573.0 | 06.09.2018 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | US201715701578 | 12.09.2017 Original published format: US201715701578 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936959 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
G05B23/0205 (EP,US);
B65G43/02 (US);
B60L13/10 (US);
B60L15/005 (US);
B65G35/06 (US);
B65G43/06 (US);
B65G54/02 (US);
G01R31/00 (US);
G05B19/0421 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] |
Former [2022/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIAGNOSE EINES SYNCHRONLINEARMOTORSYSTEMS | [2022/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS TO DIAGNOSE A LINEAR SYNCHRONOUS MOTOR SYSTEM | [2022/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER UN SYSTÈME À MOTEUR SYNCHRONE LINÉAIRE | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 12.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18192894.6 / EP3460610 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JPH0715941 (SHOWA ELECTRIC WIRE & CABLE CO) [X] 1-3,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [00 8] - [0012] - [0 15] - [0017] * [A] 5-9,13-15 [I] 4; | [A]US2015349618 (KLEINIKKINK ALBERT [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0075] , [0 76] * |