EP3928867 - MICRODEVICES AND BIOSENSOR CARTRIDGES FOR BIOLOGICAL OR CHEMICAL ANALYSIS AND SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eltoukhy, Helmy A. Hayward, 94545 / US | 02 /
Khurana, Tarun Hayward, 94545 / US | 03 /
Javanmardi, Behnam Hayward, 94545 / US | 04 /
Sabounchi, Poorya Hayward, 94545 / US | 05 /
Aghababazadeh, Majid Hayward, 94545 / US | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 21192582.1 | 20.10.2011 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | US201040735010P | 27.10.2010 Original published format: US 40735010 P | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928867 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3928867 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01L9/00, G01N21/05, G01N35/00, C12Q1/68, G01N21/64 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874 (US);
B01L3/502746 (EP,US);
B01L9/527 (EP,US);
G01N21/05 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N21/6452 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0636 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0654 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0877 (EP,US);
B01L3/5085 (EP,US);
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
G01N2021/0346 (EP,US);
G01N2021/058 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] |
Former [2021/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MIKROBAUELEMENTE UND BIOSENSORKASSETTEN ZUR BIOLOGISCHEN ODER CHEMISCHEN ANALYSE SOWIE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/52] | English: | MICRODEVICES AND BIOSENSOR CARTRIDGES FOR BIOLOGICAL OR CHEMICAL ANALYSIS AND SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR THE SAME | [2021/52] | French: | MICRODISPOSITIFS ET CARTOUCHES DE BIOCAPTEUR POUR ANALYSE CHIMIQUE OU BIOLOGIQUE ET SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 23.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11779910.6 / EP2632593 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03087410 (SEQUENOM INC [US], et al); | [X]EP1542010 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]); | [X]EP1669754 (PALO ALTO RES CT INC [US]); | [X]EP1762300 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US2009203086 (CHEN YI-JU [US], et al); | [X]WO2009111696 (BIOTROVE INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2010010904 (ARKRAY INC [JP], et al); | EP2352035 [ ] (ARKRAY INC [JP]) | by applicant | US116 | US7414 | US5641658 | US2002055100 | US2004002090 | US2004096853 | US2005100900 | WO2005065814 | US2005244870 | US7057026 | WO2006064199 | US2006188901 | US7115400 | US2006240439 | US2006281109 | WO2007010251 | US2007128624 | US2007166705 | WO2007135368 | US2008009420 | US7427673 | US2008234136 | US2008242560 | US2009127589 | US7541444 | US7566537 | US7592435 | US7595883 |