EP4141173 - HOSE ARRANGEMENT FOR CREATING A BUBBLE CURTAIN IN WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arnold Jäger Holding GmbH Lohweg 1 30559 Hannover / DE | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÄGER, Sebastian 30657 Hannover / DE | 02 /
STOFFERS, Aaron 32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | 03 /
TEKBAS, Franz 49078 Osnabrück / DE | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Bremer, Ulrich Advopat Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theaterstraße 6 30159 Hannover / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21192607.6 | 23.08.2021 | [2023/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4141173 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4141173 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E02D13/00 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
E02D13/005 (EP,US);
B05B1/207 (US);
G10K11/161 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHLAUCHANORDNUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES BLASENSCHLEIERS IN GEWÄSSERN | [2023/09] | English: | HOSE ARRANGEMENT FOR CREATING A BUBBLE CURTAIN IN WATER | [2023/09] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE TUYAU PERMETTANT DE CRÉER UNE BARRIÈRE À BULLES DANS LES EAUX | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 11.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 27.12.2023 | |
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2431531 (PRIOR ENERGY GMBH N [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]DE202014005397U (PAUL HEINZ WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102017104457 (ARNOLD JAEGER HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202013100564U | WO2014045231 | DE202014005397U | WO2018157884 |