EP3965254 - CHARGING CONTROL DEVICE, BATTERY SYSTEM AND CHARGING CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Chihiro Susono-shi, Shizuoka, 410-1194 / JP | 02 /
Syouda, Takahiro Susono-shi, Shizuoka, 410-1194 / JP | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 21192765.2 | 24.08.2021 | [2022/10] | Priority number, date | JP20200149613 | 07.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020149613 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965254 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3965254 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
H02J7/0024 (EP,CN);
H02J7/0016 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (CN);
H02J7/00714 (CN);
H02J7/007182 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | LADESTEUERVORRICHTUNG, BATTERIESYSTEM UND LADESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/10] | English: | CHARGING CONTROL DEVICE, BATTERY SYSTEM AND CHARGING CONTROL METHOD | [2022/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE RECHARGE, SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE RECHARGE | [2022/10] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 09.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | AT | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | ES | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | IT | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | NL | 31.08.2022 | PL | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SE | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.12.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/16] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2919360 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016329725 (BUTZMANN STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3276736 (LEE SEUNG GYU [KR]) [A] 1-7* the whole document * | by applicant | JP2013031247 | JP2013240155 |