EP3933517 - DYNAMIC MODIFICATION OF PRODUCTION PLANS RESPONSIVE TO MANUFACTURING DEVIATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPILA, Vivek Chicago, 60606-1596 / US | 02 /
DOSTERT, Stephen Chicago, 60606-1596 / US | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | St Clair Jones, Gregory Arthur Langley Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 21193136.5 | 18.06.2018 | [2022/01] | Priority number, date | US201715627112 | 19.06.2017 Original published format: US201715627112 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3933517 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/00, G06Q50/04 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
G05B19/00 (EP,US);
G05B19/41865 (KR);
G05B19/404 (CN);
G05B19/27 (US);
G05B19/41815 (KR);
G05B19/4183 (KR);
G06Q50/04 (EP,CN,US);
G05B2219/35519 (US);
Y02P90/02 (EP);
Y02P90/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2022/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE MODIFIKATION VON PRODUKTIONSPLÄNEN IN REAKTION AUF FERTIGUNGSABWEICHUNGEN | [2022/01] | English: | DYNAMIC MODIFICATION OF PRODUCTION PLANS RESPONSIVE TO MANUFACTURING DEVIATIONS | [2022/01] | French: | MODIFICATION DYNAMIQUE DE PLANS DE PRODUCTION SENSIBLE AUX ÉCARTS DE FABRICATION | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 23.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18178211.1 / EP3418823 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03058532 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | [A]WO2005022281 (BOEING CO [US], et al); | [A]US7242995 (MORGENSON JAMES E [US], et al); | [A]EP2019371 (BOEING CO [US]); | [I]EP2144197 (PALO ALTO RES CT INC [US]); | [I]EP2161637 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP2863280 (BOEING CO [US]); | [A]US2016207202 (LEE TRISTAN E [US], et al) |