EP3972043 - TERMINAL FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND SECONDARY BATTERY PROVIDED WITH THE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prime Planet Energy & Solutions, Inc. 2-1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0022 / JP | [2022/28] |
Former [2022/12] | For all designated states Prime Planet Energy & Solutions, Inc. 2-3-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Kosuke Tokyo, 103-0022 / JP | 02 /
SAKURAI, Takahiro Tokyo, 103-0022 / JP | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 21193349.4 | 26.08.2021 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | JP20200155913 | 17.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020155913 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3972043 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3972043 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/543 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H01M50/562 (EP,CN,KR);
H01M50/553 (EP,KR);
H01M50/552 (CN);
H01M50/566 (CN,KR,US);
B23K20/10 (CN,US);
B23K20/2333 (CN);
H01M50/103 (US);
H01M50/209 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/502 (US);
H01M50/507 (EP,KR);
H01M50/512 (EP,KR);
H01M50/522 (EP,KR);
H01M50/557 (CN);
H01M50/564 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/567 (KR);
B23K2101/36 (CN);
B23K2103/10 (CN);
B23K2103/12 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSKLEMME FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND MIT DER ANSCHLUSSKLEMME VERSEHENE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2022/12] | English: | TERMINAL FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND SECONDARY BATTERY PROVIDED WITH THE TERMINAL | [2022/12] | French: | TERMINAL POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE DOTÉE DU TERMINAL | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 11.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009087728 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]US2011052970 (KURATA KENGO [JP], et al); | [A]US2015183052 (MURAKAMI SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]CN106575741 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD); | [A]EP3467906 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2019273240 (HAGINO TOMOTAKA [JP], et al); | [A]CN111183536 (GS YUASA INT LTD) | by applicant | JP2011124024 | JP2016018675 |