02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
15.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
15.03.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
15.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
01.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
07.04.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] |
31.03.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.03.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.03.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.12.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.11.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
11.11.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
11.11.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
02.09.2022 |
Change - designated states |
published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] |
26.08.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.01.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
28.01.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.09.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
31.08.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
27.08.2021 |
Change - representative |
|