Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11196508 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2021 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US202017004736 | 27.08.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3128906 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2022 | C | CA3128906 | 27.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017004736 | 27.08.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3961942 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2023 | B1 | EP3961942 | 02.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017004736 | 27.08.2020 |