EP3962076 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VIRTUALLY BROADCASTING FROM WITHIN A VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LT, NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMRW Foundation IP SARL 14-16, Avenue Pasteur 2310 Luxembourg / LU | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yerli, Cevat 60314 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 21193491.4 | 27.08.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | US202017006327 | 28.08.2020 Original published format: US202017006327 | US202017060516 | 01.10.2020 Original published format: US202017060516 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3962076 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3962076 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/15, G06T19/00 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
G06T19/00 (EP);
H04N5/2224 (KR);
H04L67/104 (CN);
H04L65/4053 (US);
G06F3/011 (US);
G06T19/003 (US);
G06T19/006 (KR);
H04L63/08 (CN);
H04L65/4015 (US);
H04L67/1095 (CN);
H04N21/2223 (KR);
H04N21/43076 (CN);
H04N21/4318 (KR);
H04N21/4437 (KR);
H04N21/4788 (KR);
H04N21/632 (KR);
H04N21/8153 (CN);
H04N21/816 (CN);
H04N5/265 (KR);
H04N5/272 (KR);
H04N7/157 (EP);
G09B5/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VIRTUELLEN RUNDSENDEN INNERHALB EINER VIRTUELLEN UMGEBUNG | [2022/09] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VIRTUALLY BROADCASTING FROM WITHIN A VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENT | [2022/09] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DIFFUSION VIRTUELLE À PARTIR D'UN ENVIRONNEMENT VIRTUEL | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 31.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 10.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2011225039 (GOLDMAN DANIEL M [US], et al); | [XI]US2020099891 (VALLI SEPPO T [FI], et al); |