EP3954218 - LOW CALORIE FOOD COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mars, Incorporated 6885 Elm Street McLean, VA 22101 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DAMME, Isabella Bernarda Maximilienne Slough, SL14LG / GB | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21193518.4 | 17.06.2016 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | GB20150010775 | 19.06.2015 Original published format: GB 201510775 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954218 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/00, A23L33/24, A23G1/40, A23G1/54 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A23G1/40 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/24 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A23G1/00 (RU);
A23G1/54 (EP,CN,US);
A23G3/42 (RU);
A23V2002/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KALORIENARME NAHRUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2022/07] | English: | LOW CALORIE FOOD COMPOSITIONS | [2022/07] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ALIMENTAIRES PEU CALORIQUES | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 15.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16732201.5 / EP3310182 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2010200715 ; | [XI]JP2001112496 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD) [X] 11,12 * abstract * * example 1 * * example 2 *[I] 15; | [X]EP1930012 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP]) [X] 11,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] , [0032] , [0036] , [0067] , [0068]; example comparative example 11; claims 1,10-13; tables 8,9,14 *; | [XI]JP2009100658 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP) [X] 1,2,5,8,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0022] , [0048] * [I] 3,4,6,7,9,13-15; | [XDI]JP2009125064 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP) [XD] 1,2,5,8,10-12 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] - [0044]; claims 1-5 * [I] 3,4,6,7,9,13-15; | [XI]JP2009142187 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP) [X] 1,2,5,8,10-12 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0044]; claims 1-5 * [I] 3,4,6,7,9,13-15; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 62, Database accession no. 2010-L65878, XP002760858 & JP2010200715 A 20100916 (ASAHI KASEI KK) [X] 1,11,12 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0345199 | US2004217063 | JP2009125064 | - NAKAMURA, Nutrition, (20040000), vol. 20, pages 979 - 983 |