EP3960232 - UPLOADING DATA FROM AN ISOLATED SYSTEM WITHOUT COMPROMISING ISOLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novocure GmbH Park 6 6039 Root D4 / CH | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASSERMAN, Yoram 34995 Haifa / IL | 02 /
BAR-TAL, Golan 30950 Zichron Ya'akov / IL | 03 /
VARSHAVER, Michael Durham, 03824 / US | 04 /
ELKABETZ, Shimon 14136 TIBERIAS / IL | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Boden, Keith McMurray Vertus Professional Services Ltd 1 Highlands Road Reigate, RH2 0LA / GB | [2023/01] |
Former [2022/09] | Boden, Keith McMurray Vertus Professional Services ltd t/a Vertus 1 Highlands Road Reigate Surrey RH2 0LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 21193671.1 | 13.04.2020 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | US201962835147P | 17.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962835147 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3960232 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3960232 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, G16H40/67 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
A61N1/36002 (EP,CN,US);
A61N1/025 (US);
A61N1/3603 (CN);
A61N1/36031 (US);
G06F13/4068 (CN);
G06F13/4282 (CN);
A61B5/01 (US);
A61N1/36014 (EP);
G16H20/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UPLOAD VON DATEN AUS EINEM ISOLIERTEN SYSTEM OHNE BEEINTRÄCHTIGENDE ISOLIERUNG | [2022/09] | English: | UPLOADING DATA FROM AN ISOLATED SYSTEM WITHOUT COMPROMISING ISOLATION | [2022/09] | French: | TÉLÉCHARGEMENT DE DONNÉES À PARTIR D'UN SYSTÈME ISOLÉ SANS COMPROMETTRE L'ISOLATION | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 28.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20721740.7 / EP3924039 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | LU | 13.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
LU | 13.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
LU | 13.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 04.01.2023 | |
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0801959 (PHYSIO CONTROL CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007191912 (FISCHER WALLACE RAY [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011047211 (MASIMO CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018033842 (WASSERMAN YORAM [IL]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]WO2018156804 (MASIMO CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |