EP4141026 - FUSION PROTEINS COMPRISING ANTI C3B SINGLE DOMAIN ANTIBODY FOR COMPLEMENT REGULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aarhus Universitet Nordre Ringgade 1 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stub Laursen, Nick 8000 Aarhus C / DK | 02 /
Pedersen, Henrik 8000 Aarhus C / DK | 03 /
Kjeldsen Jensen, Rasmus 69126 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
Rom Andersen, Gregers 8220 Brabrand / DK | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21193927.7 | 31.08.2021 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4141026 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, C07K14/47, A61P37/00 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,KR);
A61P37/00 (EP,KR);
C07K14/472 (EP,KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/569 (EP,KR);
C07K2319/00 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUSIONSPROTEINE MIT ANTI-C3B-EINZELDOMÄNEN-ANTIKÖRPER ZUR KOMPLEMENTREGULIERUNG | [2023/09] | English: | FUSION PROTEINS COMPRISING ANTI C3B SINGLE DOMAIN ANTIBODY FOR COMPLEMENT REGULATION | [2023/09] | French: | PROTÉINES DE FUSION COMPRENANT UN ANTICORPS À DOMAINE UNIQUE ANTI-C3B POUR LA RÉGULATION DE COMPLÉMENT | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 22.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9823638 (UNIV LEICESTER [GB], et al); | [AD]WO2013142362 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al); | [XI]WO2017115059 (LAB FRANCAIS DU FRACTIONNEMENT [FR], et al); | [ID]WO2019238674 (UNIV AARHUS [DK]); | [T]WO2021257480 (CATALYST BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2013142362 | WO2019238674 |