EP3960589 - CHASSIS PLATFORM MODULE FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Mobis Co., Ltd. (Yeoksam-dong) 203, Teheran-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06141 / KR | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOO, Hyun Jin 16891 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
OH, Hyoun Young 16891 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 21194032.5 | 31.08.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | KR20200110896 | 01.09.2020 Original published format: KR 20200110896 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3960589 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3960589 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/07, B62D27/02, B62D29/00 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
B62D21/07 (EP,US);
B62D21/02 (KR);
B62D21/152 (KR);
B62D27/023 (EP,US);
B60K1/04 (US);
B60K2001/0438 (US);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
B60Y2304/07 (KR);
B60Y2306/01 (KR);
B62D21/03 (US);
B62D27/026 (EP);
B62D27/065 (KR,US);
B62D29/008 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FAHRGESTELLAUFBAUMODUL FÜR EIN ELEKTRISCHES FAHRZEUG | [2022/09] | English: | CHASSIS PLATFORM MODULE FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2022/09] | French: | MODULE DE PLATE-FORME DE CHÂSSIS POUR VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 31.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2000103356 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1 * abstract * * pos.13 first support part; Battery impl.; connection member 16; connector part 15 et.al; flanges, steps etc. of pos.16 are protrusions; paragraphs [0005] - [0107]; figure -; claim - * [A] 2-9; | [XA]EP2508412 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * Fig.5 pos.202A, 204A connection member; 202,204,208,200 first support part; Fig.6 connector part & connector members pos.702,704,700 & claim 5 'liners'; battery pos.1600; paragraphs [0004] - [0075]; figure -; claim - * [A] 2-9; | [XA]WO2013150245 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 1 - page 6, line 19; figure -; claim - *[A] 2-9; | [XA]US2018162448 (TAKAHASHI NAOKI [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0005] - [0107]; figure -; claim - * [A] 2-9 | by applicant | KR20090109752 |