EP3954816 - ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR INCORPORATING A KNITTED COMPONENT HAVING FLOATED PORTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIR, Adrian Beaverton, 97005 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21194072.1 | 07.04.2016 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US201562148531P | 16.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562148531 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954816 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3954816 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D04B1/12, // A43B1/04 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
D04B1/102 (EP,CN,US);
A43B23/0205 (CN,US);
A43B23/0245 (CN,US);
A43B23/026 (CN,US);
D04B1/123 (EP,CN);
D04B1/22 (CN,US);
D10B2403/023 (EP,CN);
D10B2403/0241 (EP,CN);
D10B2403/032 (EP,CN);
D10B2501/043 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | SCHUHWERK MIT EINEM GESTRICKTEIL, DAS FLOTTIERTE ABSCHNITTE AUFWEIST | [2022/07] | English: | ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR INCORPORATING A KNITTED COMPONENT HAVING FLOATED PORTIONS | [2022/07] | French: | ARTICLE DE CHAUSSURE INCORPORANT UN COMPOSANT TRICOTÉ AYANT DES FLOTTES | [2023/18] |
Former [2022/07] | ARTICLE DE CHAUSSURE INCORPORANT UN COMPOSANT TRICOTÉ AYANT DES FLOTTÉS | Examination procedure | 31.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 28.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16718092.6 / EP3283676 | Divisional application(s) | EP23198036.8 / EP4272593 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013126313 (NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD, et al) [X] 1-5* paragraphs [0050] , [0 59] - [0061] - [0 64] , [0 75] - [0076] - [0 80] , [ 131] - [0133]; figures 1-3, 5, 8A, 11 *; | [X]WO2015011156 (VISIOTEX GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 11, line 12 - page 18, line 2; figures 1, 3e); claims 5, 14, 17 *; | [X]US8997530 (PODHAJNY DANIEL A [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 5, line 59 - column 18, line 54; figures 1-6, 10-12; claim 1 * |