EP4142304 - IN-EAR AUDIO DEVICE WITH RESONATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GN Audio A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GKANOS, Konstantinos 2750 Ballerup / DK | 02 /
REIMERT, Jacob 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Aera A/S Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor 1153 Copenhagen K / DK | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21194120.8 | 31.08.2021 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4142304 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, H04R1/28 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
H04R1/1016 (EP,US);
H04R1/2826 (US);
H04R1/08 (US);
H04R1/1075 (EP,US);
H04R1/2869 (EP);
H04R1/288 (EP);
H04R2460/11 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] |
Former [2023/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OHRINTERNE AUDIOVORRICHTUNG MIT RESONATOR | [2023/09] | English: | IN-EAR AUDIO DEVICE WITH RESONATOR | [2023/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUDIO INTRA-AURICULAIRE AVEC RÉSONATEUR | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 28.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2269292 (PEIKER HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1-11* figure 1 *; | [A]US2020186907 (KIM SEONMI [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 5-8 *; | [XI]US2020322712 (WILLIAMS ROWAN DYLAN GOWER [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11 * figure 3 * [I] 3,4,7,10 |