EP3967397 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A HYDRO-TREATING CATALYST COMPOSITION FOR PRODUCING ULTRA-LOW SULFUR DIESEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indian Oil Corporation Limited Indian Oil Bhavan G-9, Ali Yavar Jung Marg Bandra (East) Maharashtra, Mumbai 400 051 / IN | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANTHASAMY, Ramasubramanian 121007 Faridabad / IN | 02 /
XAVIER, Kochappilly Ouseph 121007 Faridabad / IN | 03 /
KARTHIKEYAN, Mani 121007 Faridabad / IN | 04 /
PULIKOTTIL, Alex Cheru 121007 Faridabad / IN | 05 /
SAU, Madhusudan 121007 Faridabad / IN | 06 /
KAPUR, Gurpreet Singh 121007 Faridabad / IN | 07 /
RAMAKUMAR, Sankara Sri Venkata 121007 Faridabad / IN | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 21194252.9 | 01.09.2021 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | IN202021038934 | 09.09.2020 Original published format: IN202021038934 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967397 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/883, B01J37/02, C10G45/08 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B01J23/883 (EP,US);
B01J37/0207 (EP,US);
B01J21/04 (US);
B01J23/882 (US);
B01J35/19 (US);
B01J37/0203 (EP);
B01J37/0213 (US);
B01J6/001 (US);
C10G29/16 (US);
C10G45/08 (EP);
C10G2300/1055 (US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2400/04 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HYDROBEHANDLUNGSKATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ULTRASCHWEFELARMEM DIESEL | [2022/11] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A HYDRO-TREATING CATALYST COMPOSITION FOR PRODUCING ULTRA-LOW SULFUR DIESEL | [2022/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSITION DE CATALYSEUR D'HYDROTRAITEMENT POUR LA PRODUCTION DE DIESEL À TRÈS FAIBLE TENEUR EN SOUFRE | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 22.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0601722 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [A] 1-13* claim - *; | [A]US2012205292 (GABRIELOV ALEXEI GRIGORIEVICH [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * example -; claim -; table 1 *; | [IA]WO2014033653 (INDIAN OIL CORP LTD [IN]) [I] 12,13 * page 12, line 4 - page 13, line 29; example 1; claim - * [A] 1-11 | by applicant | US4012340 | US2012181219 | US2018100107 | US9987622 | US2018187094 |