EP3974804 - METHOD FOR DETECTING THE CONCENTRATION OF ORGANIC PARTICLES IN AIR AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ebm-papst neo GmbH & Co. KG Bachmühle 2 74673 Mulfingen / DE | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYSTUP, Ralph 74653 Künzelsau / DE | 02 /
WYSTUP, Frederik 74632 Neuenstein / DE | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstraße 19 80331 München / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 21194325.3 | 01.09.2021 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | DE202010124740 | 23.09.2020 Original published format: DE102020124740 | [2022/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974804 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/06, G01N1/22, B01L3/00, G01N21/85, G01N21/94, G01N15/00, G01N1/28 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
G01N15/06 (EP,CN,US);
G01N1/2205 (EP);
G01N1/286 (EP);
G01N21/85 (EP);
G01N15/01 (EP);
G01N15/075 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2001/2217 (EP);
G01N2001/2223 (EP);
G01N2001/2886 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG DER KONZENTRATION VON ORGANISCHEN PARTIKELN IN DER LUFT SOWIE VORRICHTUNG HIERFÜR | [2022/13] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING THE CONCENTRATION OF ORGANIC PARTICLES IN AIR AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2022/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA CONCENTRATION DES PARTICULES ORGANIQUES DANS L'AIR, AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 20.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2003159498 (SMALL JEANNE RUDZKI [US]) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0015] - [0050]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 8,10,11 [Y] 1-7,9,12,13,15; | [Y]US2009117555 (KUYPERS FRANCISCUS ALBERTUS [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,9,12,13 * paragraphs [0149] - [0163]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2009126514 (BURROUGHS ERIC GREGORY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0018] - [0064]; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US2010050749 (YUAN BOB [US]) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0202]; figures 1-28 * |