EP3968309 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING CONFORMANCE VOLUME BASED AIRSPACE ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Aviation Systems LLC 3290 Patterson Avenue Se Grand Rapids, MI 49512 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESTER, Edward Grand Rapids, 49512 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 21194532.4 | 02.09.2021 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | US202017020149 | 14.09.2020 Original published format: US202017020149 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3968309 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00, G06Q10/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
G08G5/0043 (EP);
G06Q10/02 (US);
G01C21/20 (US);
G06Q10/063 (EP);
G06Q30/0206 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (US);
G06Q50/40 (EP,US);
G08G5/0013 (EP);
G08G5/0026 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES KONFORMITÄTSVOLUMENBASIERTEN LUFTRAUMZUGANGS | [2022/11] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING CONFORMANCE VOLUME BASED AIRSPACE ACCESS | [2022/11] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR FOURNIR UN ACCÈS À L'ESPACE AÉRIEN BASÉ SUR LE VOLUME DE CONFORMITÉ | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/08] | 10.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016117931 (CHAN ALISTAIR K [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0142] , [0149] , [0150] , [0151] , [0158] , [0186] , [0189] , [0207] , [0210] , [0211] , [0264] , [0266] * * paragraphs [0269] - [0271] - [0277] - [0279] - [0284] - [0287] - [0293] * [I] 6,15; | [A]US2017278409 (JOHNSON ERIC DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] - [0008] - [0033] - [0046] - [0052] - [0055] *; | [XI]US2019088145 (CHAMBERS ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0023] , [0024] , [0054] - [0063] - [0073] - [0076] * [I] 6,15; | [XI]US2019340934 (VILLA IAN ANDREAS [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0052] - [0059] - [0064] , [0065] , [0067] - [0070] - [0088] , [0091] , [0104] - [0106] - [0109] , [0114] - [0116] - [0119] * * paragraphs [0123] , [0128] , [0131] , [0132] , [0138] , [0145] * [I] 6,15; | [XPI]WO2021046026 (SKYGRID LLC [US]) [XP] 1-4,8-10,13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0039] , [0062] , [0068] , [0069] , [0072] , [0090] , [0091] * [I] 5-7,11,12,15 |