EP4144596 - HOOD LIFTING MECHANISM, VEHICLE COMPRISING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR MOVING A HOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation 40531 Göteborg / SE | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELLERGÅRD, Edvin 40531 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
LÖFSTEDT, Eric 40531 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
TONBRING, Miriam 40531 Göteborg / SE | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21194638.9 | 02.09.2021 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144596 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4144596 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/38, B62D25/12, B62D25/10 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
B60R21/38 (EP,US);
B62D25/12 (EP,US);
B62D25/087 (US);
B62D25/105 (EP);
E05Y2900/536 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | B60R21/38, B62D25/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | HAUBENHEBEMECHANISMUS, FAHRZEUG DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEWEGEN EINER HAUBE | [2023/10] | English: | HOOD LIFTING MECHANISM, VEHICLE COMPRISING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR MOVING A HOOD | [2023/10] | French: | MÉCANISME DE LEVAGE DE CAPOT, VÉHICULE COMPRENANT CE MÉCANISME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPLACEMENT DE CAPOT | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 28.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2006028051 (BREI DIANN [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0068]; figures 5A, 5B * [Y] 8-14; | [Y]US2020262482 (MAKOWSKI MATTHEW B [US], et al) [Y] 8-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102019108937 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]DE102019125586 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |