EP4145157 - BATTERY SYSTEM STATE OF HEALTH MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dukosi Limited Building 7, Quantum Court Research Avenue South Edinburgh, EH14 4AP / GB | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buhari, Mohammed Sulaiman Edinburgh / GB | 02 /
Darroch, Jim Edinburgh / GB | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21195133.0 | 06.09.2021 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4145157 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/392 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
G01R31/392 (EP,KR);
G01R19/12 (KR);
G01R29/24 (KR);
G01R31/367 (KR);
G01R31/3842 (KR);
G01R31/396 (KR);
G06N3/0499 (EP);
G06N3/048 (EP);
G06N3/084 (EP);
G06N3/09 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] |
Former [2023/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES GESUNDHEITSZUSTANDS EINES BATTERIESYSTEMS | [2023/10] | English: | BATTERY SYSTEM STATE OF HEALTH MONITORING SYSTEM | [2023/10] | French: | ÉTAT DU SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE DU SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE SANTÉ | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 08.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012271578 (NAREID HELGE [GB]); | [XI]DE102015016987 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [A]EP3351953 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2020081070 (CHEMALI EPHREM [CA], et al); | by applicant | CN110824364 |