EP3958259 - DECODING AUDIO BITSTREAMS WITH ENHANCED SPECTRAL BAND REPLICATION METADATA IN AT LEAST ONE FILL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states Dolby International AB 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / NL | ||
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Mr. Treublaan 7 1097 DP Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLEMOES, Lars 113 30 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
PURNHAGEN, Heiko 113 30 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
EKSTRAND, Per 113 30 Stockholm / SE | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2022/42] |
Former [2022/08] | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Application number, filing date | 21195190.0 | 10.03.2016 | [2022/08] | Priority number, date | EP20150159067 | 13.03.2015 Original published format: EP 15159067 | US201562133800P | 16.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562133800 P | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958259 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3958259 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3958259 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/16, G10L21/038, G10L19/24, // G10L19/035 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
G10L19/167 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G10L19/24 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
G10L19/035 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G10L19/16 (IL,RU);
G10L21/038 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] |
Former [2022/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DECODIERUNG VON AUDIOBITSTRÖMEN MIT ERWEITERTEN SPEKTRALBANDREPLIKATIONSMETADATEN IN MINDESTENS EINEM FÜLLELEMENT | [2022/08] | English: | DECODING AUDIO BITSTREAMS WITH ENHANCED SPECTRAL BAND REPLICATION METADATA IN AT LEAST ONE FILL ELEMENT | [2022/08] | French: | DÉCODAGE DE FLUX BINAIRES AUDIO À L'AIDE DE MÉTADONNÉES DE BANDE SPECTRALE AMÉLIORÉE DANS AU MOINS UN ÉLÉMENT DE REMPLISSAGE | [2022/08] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 04.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16709426.7 / EP3268961 | EP19213743.8 / EP3657500 | Divisional application(s) | EP22202090.1 / EP4141866 | EP24152023.8 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | RS | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | IE | 10.03.2023 | LU | 10.03.2023 | [2024/08] |
Former [2024/02] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
LU | 10.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 19.10.2022 | |
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HR | 19.10.2022 | |
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | HR | 19.10.2022 | |
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 |