Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
07.11.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.09.2023 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.02.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
07.09.2021 | Change - representative |