EP4145457 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMAGE-BASED OPERATIONAL DECISION SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthineers AG Siemensstraße 3 91301 Forchheim / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2023/10] | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kartmann, René 90491 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Krüger, Benedikt 96250 Ebensfeld / DE | 03 /
Gall, Peter 91080 Uttenreuth / DE | 04 /
Gühring, Jens 91052 Erlangen / DE | 05 /
Lauer, Lars 91077 Neunkirchen / DE | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Siemens Healthineers Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21195358.3 | 07.09.2021 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4145457 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H30/40, G06N3/00, G16H40/63 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/09 (EP);
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G16H30/20 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP);
G06N3/0464 (EP);
G06N3/096 (EP);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BILDBASIERTEN OPERATIVEN ENTSCHEIDUNGSUNTERSTÜTZUNG | [2023/10] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMAGE-BASED OPERATIONAL DECISION SUPPORT | [2023/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA DÉCISION OPÉRATIONNELLE À BASE D'IMAGES | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 06.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005049497 (KRISHNAN SRIRAM [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0042] - [0044] *; | [A]US2010086189 (WANG XIAOHUI [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]EP3599611 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-17* paragraphs [0005] , [0046] , [0059] - [0060] *; | [XI]EP3758015 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-10,15-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0012] - [0033] , [0051] - [0053] - [0087] - [0095] * [I] 11-14 | by applicant | US6574304 | EP3637424 | EP3837693 |