EP3940369 - METHOD OF MEASURING AT LEAST ONE TIME-VARYING SIGNAL EMISSION FROM THE CONTENTS OF A RECEPTACLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gen-Probe Incorporated 10210 Genetic Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OPALSKY, David San Diego, 92130 / US | 02 /
HAGEN, Norbert D Carlsbad, 92009 / US | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 21195541.4 | 07.03.2014 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | US201361782340P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361782340 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3940369 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3940369 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/25, G01N21/64 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
G01N21/253 (EP,US);
G02B6/3668 (US);
G01N21/6452 (EP,US);
G02B6/06 (US);
G02B6/08 (US);
G02B6/3672 (US);
G02B6/4214 (EP,US);
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
G02B6/4269 (US);
G01N2021/6484 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] |
Former [2022/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG MINDESTENS EINER ZEITLICH VERÄNDERLICHEN SIGNALABGABE AUS DEM INHALT EINES BEHÄLTERS | [2022/03] | English: | METHOD OF MEASURING AT LEAST ONE TIME-VARYING SIGNAL EMISSION FROM THE CONTENTS OF A RECEPTACLE | [2022/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'AU MOINS UNE ÉMISSION DE SIGNAL VARIANT DANS LE TEMPS À PARTIR DU CONTENU D'UN RÉCEPTACLE | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 05.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14715169.0 / EP2972222 | EP19173015.9 / EP3599458 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1087222 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [Y] 6 * [0004], [0006]-[0007], [0035]-[0037];; figures 1A-1B *; | [Y]US2002037526 (TASHIRO HIDEO [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * [0019], [0072]-[0073];; figure 10 *; | [A]US2005064582 (WITTWER CARL T [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,6,10-14 * figures 11A, 12, 12A-C, 13, 17 *; | [XYI]US7081226 (WITTWER CARL T [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10-14 * figures 9A-9G, 11, 11A, 12C, 19 * [Y] 6 [I] 2,3; | [A]US2009226926 (MARSHALL DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,6,10-14 * [0036];; figure 24 *; | [Y]US2012190034 (TAJIMA HIDEJI [JP]) [Y] 6 * [0005], [0014], [0084];; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2012295249 (CHERUBINI CLAUDIO [CH], et al) [Y] 6 * [0176]-[0177];; figure 1 *; | [XYI] - DE SILVA D ET AL, "Monitoring hybridization during polymerase chain reaction", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20000401), vol. 741, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0378-4347(00)00055-4, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 3 - 13, XP004197020 [X] 1,10,14 * figures 3A-3C * [Y] 6 [I] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(00)00055-4 | [A] - CREWS N ET AL, "Product differentiation during continuous-flow thermal gradient PCR", LAB ON A CHIP, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, vol. 8, no. 6, doi:10.1039/B716437H, ISSN 1473-0197, (20080101), pages 919 - 924, (20080418), XP002571188 [A] 1-3,5,6,10-14 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b716437h | [A] - LYON ELAINE ET AL, "LightCycler Technology in Molecular Diagnostics", THE JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR INVESTIGATIVE PATHOLOGY, US, (20090301), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.2353/JMOLDX.2009.080094, ISSN 1525-1578, pages 93 - 101, XP009171728 [A] 1-3,5,6,10-14 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2353/jmoldx.2009.080094 | [A] - LINDSAY N. SANFORD ET AL, "Monitoring temperature with fluorescence during real-time PCR and melting analysis", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (20130301), vol. 434, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.ab.2012.10.037, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 26 - 33, XP055058830 [A] 1-3,5,6,10-14 * page 30, col 2, paragraphs 2-4;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2012.10.037 | by applicant | US4683195 | US4766062 | US4851330 | US5399491 | US5427930 | US5455166 | US5541308 | US5846717 | US5925517 | US5928862 | US5994056 | US6150097 | US6335166 | US6361945 | US6410278 | US6541205 | US7897337 | US7932081 | US8008066 | US2014038192 | WO2012US96523 |