EP3967482 - METHOD FOR FORMING A GUM ROLL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Bandag, LLC 2000 Bandag Drive Muscatine, IA 52761 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUDAS, Milton B. Muscatine, IA 52761 / US | 02 /
FOSS, Timothy T. Bettendorf, IA 52722 / US | 03 /
SCHLAPKOHL, Merle R. Durant, IA 52747 / US | 04 /
SCHURR, Jerod E. Muscatine, IA 52761 / US | 05 /
ZECK, Chad M.Muscatine Muscatine, IA 52761 / US | 06 /
TOMTSCHIK, Alexander G. Muscatine, IA 52761 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21195850.9 | 09.09.2021 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | US202063076223P | 09.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063076223 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967482 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/00, B65H18/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B29D30/0016 (EP);
B65D85/672 (US);
B65B11/04 (US);
B65B63/04 (US);
B65D71/0088 (US);
B65H18/10 (US);
B65H19/2207 (US);
B65H19/2276 (EP);
B65H19/2292 (US);
B65H19/29 (EP);
B65H19/30 (US);
B29D2030/0038 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINER GUMMI-ROLLE | [2022/11] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A GUM ROLL | [2022/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE BOBINE GOMME | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 14.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO0121520 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US], et al); | [Y]DE19957990 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP1236669 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]); | [Y]EP1818163 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]); | [XYI]EP2116496 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]); | [Y]US2011259498 (PAGANO SALVATORE [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2016103077 (PIRELLI [IT]) |